Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/26/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/26/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2010