Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/28/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/04/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/23/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/18/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/29/2010