Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/21/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/2010