Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/08/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/30/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/06/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/27/2010