Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/22/2010