Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/15/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 10/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/26/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/03/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 11/04/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 11/05/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/16/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/03/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/23/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/23/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/24/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/13/2010