Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/17/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/30/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/30/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/30/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/30/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/02/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/27/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/30/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/13/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/19/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/03/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/10/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/10/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/10/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/24/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/31/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/10/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/21/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/28/2010