Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/19/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/24/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/24/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/10/2009