Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/24/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/24/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/24/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/24/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/28/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/28/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/28/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/28/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/14/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/25/2010