Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/11/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/09/2010