Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/09/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/25/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/07/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/11/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/14/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/10/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/15/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/15/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/17/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/30/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/01/2010