There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fire Sprinkler Incentive Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to classify automatic fire sprinkler systems as 5-year property for purposes of depreciation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/25/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/25/2009Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (138)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/11/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/31/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 10/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/20/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/20/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/11/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/26/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/25/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1194. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/2009)

Fire Sprinkler Incentive Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to classify automatic fire sprinkler systems as five-year depreciable property. Makes this Act applicable to property placed in service after April 11, 2003.