Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/26/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/18/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/31/2009