Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/02/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/24/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/20/2009