Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/26/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/26/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/03/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/29/2010