Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/14/2009