Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/23/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/22/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/18/2009