Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/23/2010