Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/16/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/22/2010