Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/12/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/09/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/23/2010