Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/23/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/30/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/03/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/10/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/14/2010