Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/14/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/02/2010