Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/03/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/06/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/06/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/06/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/10/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/10/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/17/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/18/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/18/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/24/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/24/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/30/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/02/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/02/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/02/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/27/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/04/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/12/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/08/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/17/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/06/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/06/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/11/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/11/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/27/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/27/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/02/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/04/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/04/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/25/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/26/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/10/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/13/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/13/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/27/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/27/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/30/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/01/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/01/2010