Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/03/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/04/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/04/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/04/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/11/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/11/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/11/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/11/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/11/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/12/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/12/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/17/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/01/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/01/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/22/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/28/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/11/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/11/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/13/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/09/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/13/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/26/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/14/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/03/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/09/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/16/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/17/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/19/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/19/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/22/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/29/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/04/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/24/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/14/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/22/2010