Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/18/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/02/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/04/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009