Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/09/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/19/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/30/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/31/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/31/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/31/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 04/01/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/01/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/01/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/05/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/03/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/21/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/19/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew