Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/23/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/23/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/12/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/18/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/23/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/31/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/22/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/22/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/22/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/22/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/22/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/22/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 10/22/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/12/2010