Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/03/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/06/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/23/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/29/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/16/2010