Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/02/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/04/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/23/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/08/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/30/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/16/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/28/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/15/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/28/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2010