Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/28/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/2009