Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/14/2010