Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/19/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/14/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/14/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/06/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/21/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/08/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/08/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/21/2010