Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/04/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/04/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/04/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/05/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/10/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/07/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/15/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/15/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/15/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 11/03/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/12/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/26/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/10/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/21/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/28/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/19/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/23/2010