Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/26/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/17/2009