Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/08/2009