There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect the interests of each resident of intermediate care facilities for the mentally retarded in class action lawsuits on behalf of such resident.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/03/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/03/2009Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/03/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/11/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/26/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/01/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/19/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/17/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/10/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/13/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/27/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/26/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/12/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/04/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/20/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/09/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/10/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/21/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/22/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/25/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/29/2010
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2009 04/21/2009 --
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/16/2009 03/16/2010 --
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/22/2009 03/24/2010 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/03/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1255.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1255. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/03/2009)

Prohibits any entity that receives funds from the federal government from using them to file a class action lawsuit against an intermediate care facility for the mentally retarded on behalf of any facility resident unless the resident (or the resident's legal representative), after receiving notice of the proposed class action lawsuit, has the opportunity to elect not to have the action apply to the resident.