Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/11/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/26/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/01/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/19/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/17/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/09/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/10/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/13/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/27/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/21/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/22/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/26/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/12/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/04/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/20/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/09/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/10/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/21/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/22/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/25/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/29/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew