There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Dextromethorphan Distribution Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to House

Dextromethorphan Distribution Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Dextromethorphan Distribution Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to the distribution of the drug dextromethorphan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/31/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 8 (Roll no. 167).(text: CR 3/30/2009 H4086)
03/24/2009Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-49.
03/03/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
04/01/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
03/31/2009-1:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/31/2009-1:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 8 (Roll no. 167). (text: CR 3/30/2009 H4086)
03/31/2009-1:35pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4144)
03/30/2009-3:52pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/30/2009-3:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1259.
03/30/2009-3:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4086-4087)
03/30/2009-3:46pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/24/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 19.
03/24/2009HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-49.
03/04/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/04/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/04/2009HouseSubcommittee on Health Discharged.
03/03/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/03/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/03/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/03/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/03/2009 Referred to
03/04/2009 Markup by
03/24/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-49
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/03/2009 Referred to
03/04/2009 Discharged from
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/01/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1259.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1259. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/31/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Dextromethorphan Distribution Act of 2009 - Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to deem to be adulterated any unfinished dextromethorphan that is possessed, received, or distributed in violation of this Act.

Prohibits a person from: (1) possessing or receiving unfinished dextromethorphan unless the person is registered with the Secretary of Health and Human Services as a producer of a drug or device or otherwise registered, licensed, or approved pursuant to federal or state law to engage in the practice of pharmacy, pharmaceutical production, or manufacture or distribution of drug ingredients; or (2) distributing unfinished dextromethorphan to any person other than a registered or otherwise authorized person. Excludes from such prohibitions common carriers that possess, receive, or distribute unfinished dextromethorphan for purposes of distributing it between registered, licensed, or approved persons.