Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/03/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/01/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/12/2010