Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/11/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/11/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 04/01/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/22/2009