Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/03/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/05/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/12/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/01/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/30/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/30/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/05/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/05/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/05/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/27/2010