Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/10/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/11/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/17/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/03/2010