Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/22/2009