Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/06/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/16/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/02/2009