Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/02/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/27/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/12/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/28/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/20/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/20/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/16/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew