Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/08/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/09/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/13/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/21/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/10/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/11/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/15/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/16/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/21/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 12/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/19/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/20/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/18/2010