Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009