Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/17/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/07/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/07/2009