Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 03/04/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/18/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/25/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/25/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/20/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/11/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/24/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/24/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/02/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/13/2010