There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Mental Health Screening and Assessment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Defense to adopt a program of professional and confidential screenings to detect mental health injuries acquired during deployment in support of a contingency operation and ultimately to reduce the incidence of suicide among veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/04/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
03/31/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/06/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/04/2009Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/2009Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/2009Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/17/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/17/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/02/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/06/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/22/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services03/04/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/31/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs03/04/2009 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/06/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1308.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1308. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/04/2009)

Veterans Mental Health Screening and Assessment Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the increasing rate of suicide among veterans returning from Operations Enduring Freedom and Iraqi Freedom is a serious problem; and (2) the Secretary of Defense should conduct mandatory, face-to-face, and confidential mental health and traumatic brain injury screenings for each member of the Armed Forces (member) during the period beginning 90 days after the member completes a deployment in support of a contingency operation and ending 180 days thereafter.

Directs the Secretary to carry out such screenings. Prohibits the Secretary from prohibiting a member from returning to the United States due to any screening result or determination.

Requires the Secretary and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a joint protocol to share existing and future reports from confidential screenings conducted to help aid members in their transition from health care and treatment provided by the Department of Defense (DOD) to health care and treatment provided by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA).